CA AB1275 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 130209.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health.
Title
Health information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1275 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1275 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Senate Rules Suspended |
2023-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 6. Page 1605.) |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 3). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and L. GOV. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 130209.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |