CA AB1279 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-01 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-01 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4827 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1834.6, 1834.7, 1846, and 1847 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 17003, 31607, 31621, 31622, 32001, and 32003 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 121916 and 122322 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 597, 597.1, 597.2, 597e, 597f, 597u, 597v, and 599e of the Penal Code, relating to animal shelters.
Title
Animal shelters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1279 Fletcher (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1279 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1279 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2011-07-01 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. Action rescinded whereby bill was ordered to enrollment and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor. Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:55 a.m. | |
2011-06-20 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-06-20 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1472.). | |
2011-06-15 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1351.) | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1834.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1834.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1846 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 17003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 31607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 31621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 31622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 32001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 32003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 121916 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 599 | Amended Code | Citation Text |