CA AB1391 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 131, 662, 739, 739.3, 985, 1011, 1011.1, 1012, 1016, 1070.6, 1216.1, 1624, 1675, 1749.3, 1749.31, 1749.32, 1749.33, 1749.8, 1758.3, 1872.87, 10234.93, 10785, 11620, 12414.25, and 14090.1 of, to add Sections 1758.681 and 12389.7 to, and to repeal Section 668.5 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: omnibus.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1391 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PEREA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1391 Committee on INS. (Perea) By Calderon (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1391 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1391 Committee on INS. (Perea) By Calderon (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1391 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2694.). |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1943.). |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1345.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |