CA AB1393 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 90001.5 to, to add Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 76010) to Chapter 1 of Part 47 of Division 7 of Title 3 of, and to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 92660) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to foster youth.
Title
Foster youth.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Curren Price [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Asm. Alberto Torrico [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1393 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Skinner By Leno (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1393 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Skinner By Leno (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1393 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-04 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2009-08-31 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2808.) | |
2009-08-27 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 1964.) | |
2009-07-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-11 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1362.) | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |