CA AB1395 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1872.81 and 12975.9 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: special assessments: Seismic Safety Account.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1395 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1395 Perea (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1395 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1395 Perea (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1395 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 6210.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4551.). |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1345.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12975.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1775.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1872.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |