CA AB1456 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to sexually violent predators.
Title
Sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23652.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |