CA AB1474 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1374.34 of, to add Chapter 13.6 (commencing with Section 121287) to Part 4 of Division 105 of, and to add and repeal Section 128225.5 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 14105.33, 14105.436, and 14105.86 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 14593 of, and to add Sections 14087.9730 and 14132.56 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1474 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1474 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 15). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3784.) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5076.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 121287 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128225.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.436 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14593 | New Code | See Bill Text |