CA AB1482 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 1946.2, 1947.12, and 1947.13 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenant Protection Act of 2019: tenancy: rent caps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1482 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1482 Chiu et al. By Atkins (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1482 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1482 Chiu et al. By Atkins (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1482 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 3440.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2732.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2608.) |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 2128.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1725.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1946.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1947.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1947.13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |