CA AB1490 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13169.5 to the Water Code, relating to water quality.
Title
State Water Resources Control Board: school drinking water.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13169.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |