CA AB1504 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4512, 4513, and 4551 of, and to add Section 4512.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to forest resources.
Title
Forest resources: carbon sequestration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1504 Skinner Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1504 Skinner By Pavley (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1504 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1504 Skinner By Pavley (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1504 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 534, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-15 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6953.) | |
2010-08-31 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5085.) | |
2010-08-30 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-26 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3917.) | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 21). | |
2010-01-14 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-01-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (January 12). | |
2010-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |