CA AB1509 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 647, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 647, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 90 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: transition assistance.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1509 FOX Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1509 Fox By Roth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1509 FOX Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1509 Fox By Roth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1509 FOX Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 647, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 6397.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4730.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 5287.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |