CA AB1518 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 648, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 648, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 532 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the military.
Title
Military: National Guard: youth challenge program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1518 Eggman By Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1518 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1518 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 648, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4724.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., V.A. and APPR. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5343.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and ED. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |