CA AB1532 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 20005 to the Vehicle Code, relating to accidents.
Title
Vehicle: accidents.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] | Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1532 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1532 Gatto By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1532 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1532 Gatto By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1532 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6320.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.) |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4655.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 5236.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 20002.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 20005 | New Code | See Bill Text |