CA AB1550 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3579 of the Government Code, relating to higher education labor relations.
Title
Higher education labor relations: employee organizations.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1550 Luz Rivas et al. By Leyva (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1550 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1550 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2360.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1695.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 1814.) |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1577.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28). |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3579 | Amended Code | Citation Text |