CA AB1564 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 759, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1798.130 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer privacy: consumer request for disclosure methods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1564 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1564 Berman By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1564 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 759, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3513.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2820.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1631.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.130Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback