CA AB1565 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency Management Assistance Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1565 E.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1565 E.M (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - AB 1565 Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1565 E.M (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - AB 1565 Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4984.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and APPR. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2040.). |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 3. |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 179.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |