CA AB1575 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66283 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: students codes of conduct: advisers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1575 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3950.) |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66283 | New Code | See Bill Text |