CA AB1586 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10353 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: hiring: priority consideration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1586 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1586 Holden By Lara (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1586 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1586 Holden By Lara (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1586 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6321.). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4660.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5159.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14). |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 30). |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set. |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10353 | Amended Code | Citation Text |