CA AB1586 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.10 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: Temperance Flat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |