CA AB1588 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2923.5 of, and to add Article 1.7 (commencing with Section 2946) to Chapter 2 of Title 14 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to mortgage defaults, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Monitored Mortgage Workout Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Karen Bass [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Pedro Nava [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-02-12 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2010-02-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-10-26 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2009-09-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee October 10. | |
2009-09-09 | Read first time. To print. |