CA AB1594 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 40507 and 41781.3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Waste management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1594 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1594 Williams By Hill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1594 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1594 Williams By Hill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1594 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 6655.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4893.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 5360.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 28). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 40507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 41781.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |