CA AB1597 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25123.3, 25160, 25160.2, 25160.5, 25205.15, 25207.5, and 25250.29 of, to repeal Sections 25160.3, 25160.4, and 25160.6 of, and to add Section 25160.01 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: transportation: electronic manifests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - AB 1597 E.S. & T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By QUIRK (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1597 E.S. & T.M (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1597 E.S. & T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1597 E.S. & T.M (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1597 E.S. & T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2566.). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1879.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1362.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25123.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25205.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25207.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25250.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |