CA AB1603 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 459.5, 487, and 490.2 of the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Theft: shoplifting: amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 459.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 487 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 490.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |