CA AB1612 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51013.1 of, and to add Section 51015.6 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 44273 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1546.1 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 3401 and 25751 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 379.6, 388, 399.20, and 2827.10 of, to add Sections 388.2 and 784.1 to, and to repeal Section 2834 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources: energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1612 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1612 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17). |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4868.) In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4552.) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4410.) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4576.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51013.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51015.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44273 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1546.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25751 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2834 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 379.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 388.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 784.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |