CA AB1639 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22952, 22956, 22958, and 22962 of, and to add Sections 22964.5, 22980.15, and 26070.3 to, the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 119408 to, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 128590) to Part 3 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 308 of the Penal Code, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 30135) to Chapter 2 of Part 13 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to tobacco and cannabis products, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tobacco and cannabis products.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Assembly - AB 1639 GRAY Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2966.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2966.) |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2882.) |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22952 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22958 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22964.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22980.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26070.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 119408 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30135 | New Code | See Bill Text |