CA AB1666 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 881, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 881, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89513 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 86 of the Penal Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign funds: bribery fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1666 GARCIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1666 Garcia By Padilla (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1666 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1666 Garcia By Padilla (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1666 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 881, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6562.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4852.). |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4972.) |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 83124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |