CA AB1718 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 193, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 193, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10150.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate brokers.
Title
Real estate broker licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1718 Hill By Price (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 1718 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 1718 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 193, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-09 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-08-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4441.). | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-04-30 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4599.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2012-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10150.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |