CA AB1721 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69437 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: Cal Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1721 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1721 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 5214.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 27). |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69435 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69436 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69437 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69439 | Amended Code | Citation Text |