CA AB1783 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14839.1 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 2002 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: small business preferences.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1783 Perea (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1783 PEREA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1783 PEREA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-06-28 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-06-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4182.). | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-05-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4675.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14839.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14839.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 2002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |