CA AB1789 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50607 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |