CA AB1811 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 237 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 203 of, and to add Section 203.5 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to jury duty.
Title
Jury duty: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 237 | Amended Code | Citation Text |