CA AB1826 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 309.5, 5800, 5810, 5820, 5830, 5840, 5850, 5860, 5870, 5880, 5895, 5900, and 5930 of, to amend the heading of Division 2.5 (commencing with Section 5800) of, and to add Sections 5841 and 5855 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Digital Equity in Video Franchising Act of 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2024-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. |
2024-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 309.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5841 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5860 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5870 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5895 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |