CA AB1828 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15626 of the Government Code, relating to the State Board of Equalization.
Title
State Board of Equalization: members: conflicts of interest.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 13). |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |