CA AB1834 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9620 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 80713, 80714, and 80822 of the Water Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Resource adequacy: Electricity Supply Strategic Reliability Reserve Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 9620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 80713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 80714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 80822 | Amended Code | Citation Text |