CA AB1857 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 39601.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air quality.
Title
State Air Resources Board: air quality regulation: valleys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39601.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |