CA AB1880 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6750 of the Family Code, relating to minors.
Title
Minors: artistic employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Alanis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Assembly - AB 1880 Alanis Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.) |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |