CA AB1881 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3509 of the Government Code, relating to public employee relations.
Title
Public employee relations: Los Angeles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1881 Jones-Sawyer By Padilla (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1881 Jones-Sawyer Reconsider (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1881 Jones-Sawyer By Padilla (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1881 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1881 Jones-Sawyer Reconsider (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1881 Jones-Sawyer By Padilla (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1881 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4816.). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 12. Page 4764.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Padilla. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 4765.) |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 4956.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 7). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E.,R. & S.S. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |