CA AB1888 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 106.5 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Division of Labor Standards Enforcement: Labor Trafficking Unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and PUB. S. |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 106.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |