CA AB1917 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.0095 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10112.298 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Outpatient prescription drugs: cost sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1917 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1917 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez. |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5257.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 29). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.0095 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.298 | New Code | See Bill Text |