CA AB1927 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 845 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Easements: maintenance: arbitration.
Sponsors
Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-13 - Assembly - AB 1927 JONES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1927 Jones (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1927 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1927 Jones (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1927 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2012-08-13 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5889.). | |
2012-08-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4443.). | |
2012-07-06 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4776.) | |
2012-05-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-03 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-10 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |