CA AB1929 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 674, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 674, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5892.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
California Housing Finance Agency: MHSA funding: special needs housing for person with mental illness.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1929 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1929 Chau By DeSaulnier (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1929 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1929 Chau By DeSaulnier (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1929 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 674, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6352.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4706.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and T. & H. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5202.) |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21). |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 51312.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |