CA AB1933 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 59, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 59, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53601 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: investments.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1933 Levine (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1933 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1933 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 59, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3930.). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4710.) |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |