CA AB1934 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3303 and 3603 of the Financial Code, relating to financial regulation.
Title
Digital financial asset businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Assembly - AB 1934 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 3303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 3603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |