CA AB197 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 37202, 46114, 46117, and 46118 of, to amend and repeal Sections 8973, 46111, and 46119 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 46112 of, the Education Code, relating to kindergarten.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Full-day kindergarten.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 197 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB197 Weber et al. By Leyva (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 197 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15.).
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 1921.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 13).
2019-02-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2019-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code37202Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code46111Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code46112New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code46114New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code46117Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code46118Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code46119Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code8973Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback