CA AB197 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65589.9 of, and to add Section 65583.4 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 50250, 50251, 50252, 50253, 50254, 50470, 50515.04, 50515.05, 50607, 50608, 50672, 50672.1, 50672.2, 50675.1.3, 50704.80, 50704.82, 50720.2, 50720.4, 50720.6, 50720.8, 50780, 50781, 50782, 50783, 50784, 50784.5, 50784.6, 50785, 50786, 50787, 50896.3, 50899.1, 50899.2, 50899.3, 50899.4, 50899.5, 50899.6, 50899.7, 53559, and 53559.1 of, to amend and renumber Section 53599.2 of, to add Section 50252.1 to, to add Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 51520) to Part 3 of Division 31 of, and to repeal Section 50784.7 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 8256 and 8257 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 197 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 197 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2022-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 510.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |