CA AB1988 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 125107 and 125220 of, to amend, renumber, and add Sections 125222 and 125224 of, to add Sections 125225, 125225.1, and 125225.2 to, and to repeal Sections 125221 and 125223 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
North County Transit District: flexible procurement process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 125107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 125220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 125221 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 125222 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 125223 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 125224 | New Code | See Bill Text |