CA AB1997 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 22119.2 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 22104.8, 22115, 22119.3, 22119.5, 22121, 22170, 22317.5, 22701, and 22905 of, and to add Sections 22156.07, 22156.08, and 22324.5 to, the Education Code, relating to retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Teachers’ Retirement Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1997 McKinnor Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22104.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22119.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22119.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22119.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22170 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22317.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22701 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22905 | New Code | See Bill Text |