CA AB1999 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51 and 54 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 32228 of the Education Code, to amend Section 354.5 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 11135, 12920, 12921, 12926, 12926.1, and 12940 of the Government Code, to amend Section 868.8 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 4900 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: family caregiver status protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1999 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1999 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5093.) | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-01 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 32228 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 354.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 868.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |