CA AB20 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 11050) to Part 1 of Division 3 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to undocumented workers.
Title
Undocumented workers: California Agricultural Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Agriculture (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 20 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Agriculture (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 20 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Set first hearing. Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and AGRI. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 1917.) |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 11050 | New Code | See Bill Text |