CA AB2022 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 780, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 780, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4532 and 4534 of, and to repeal Section 4534.1 of, the Government Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: Target Area Contract Preference Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2022 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2022 Medina By Block (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2022 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2022 Medina By Block (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2022 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 780, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 6324.). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4652.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5259.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and J., E.D., & E. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 4531 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4533 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4534 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4534.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |